Mazurek, Emma Mae (CPSO#: 97679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
62 King St. West
Dundas ON  L9H 1T8
Phone: (905) 627-3526
Fax: (905) 628-9996
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA MAE MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014