Mazurek, Matthew Thomas (CPSO#: 103382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
727 Jane St.
Toronto ON  M6N 4B3
Phone: 416-763-8880
Fax: 416-763-3444
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queenston Walk In Clinic
631 Queenston Rd.
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Canada
Phone: 905-578-9255
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW THOMAS MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2016