Mazurek, Michael Francis (CPSO#: 33718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Room 4U5
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76417
Fax: (905) 521-2656
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosebush Mazurek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rosebush ( CPSO# 53584 )
Dr. M. Mazurek ( CPSO# 33718 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Suite F401
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4U5
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL FRANCIS MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1986