Mazurik, Laurel Anne (CPSO#: 60101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Dept Of Emergency Medicine C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ORNGE
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga
Toronto ON  L4W 5H8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREL ANNE MAZURIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZURIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991