Mazurka, John Leslie (CPSO#: 28442)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Mazurka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Juravinski Cancer Centre 699 Concession Street Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Date Received: 19 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Mar 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016