Mazurski, Karen Lavenia (CPSO#: 33431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: Macleod, Karen Lavenia (used until: 26 Jul 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-2258
Fax: (807) 223-4733
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Mazurski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mazurski ( CPSO# 33431 )

Business Address:
Dryden Regional Health Centre
40 Goodall Street
Box 3011
Dryden ON  P8N 2V8
Phone Number: (807) 223-2258

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LAVENIA MAZURSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZURSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982