Mazzulli, Tonino (CPSO#: 55754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Microbiology
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 1487
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4695
Fax: (416) 586-8746
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONINO MAZZULLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZULLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986