Mc Quillan, Rory Francis (CPSO#: 91567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  17 Jul 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
8N 842
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5617
Fax: (416) 340-4289
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mc Quillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mc Quillan ( CPSO# 91567 )

Business Address:
UHN-Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Room 8N-842
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 640-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 18 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rory Francis Mc Quillan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Nephrology,  University  of  Toronto, in which Dr. Mc
                        Quillan  holds  an academic appointment at the  rank  of  Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Mc Quillan  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that Dr. Mc Quillan's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Mc  Quillan's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued  on  July  18,  2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on July 17, 2020.