McAlister, Chryssa Nuala Gabriella (CPSO#: 87265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 306
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 579-7000
Fax: (888) 465-6912
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chryssa McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McAlister ( CPSO# 87265 )

Business Address:
Belmont Professional Centre
306 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 579-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRYSSA NUALA GABRIELLA MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013