McAlister, Edward Daniel (CPSO#: 82769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 792-6222
Fax: (866) 544-6388
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.D. McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. McAlister ( CPSO# 82769 )

Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
Unit 401
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-6222

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Surgery
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD DANIEL MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010