McAlister, Neil Harding (CPSO#: 28603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L6
Phone: (905) 434-1997
Fax: (905) 434-7448
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Central Clinics at Walmart
2202 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 614-7999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. McAlister ( CPSO# 30972 )
Dr. N. McAlister ( CPSO# 28603 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L6
Phone Number: (905) 434-1997

Business Address:
2202 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 614-7999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL HARDING MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976