McAlister, Vivian Charles (CPSO#: 62815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C4-211
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2920
Fax: (855) 538-2926
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.C. McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. McAlister ( CPSO# 62815 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C8-005
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN CHARLES MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990