Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McAllister, John Douglas (CPSO#: 56706)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000