McAllister, Terrance Blake (CPSO#: 58287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-2366
Fax: (905) 721-2274
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry McAllister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Field ( CPSO# 58604 )
Dr. T. McAllister ( CPSO# 58287 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-2386

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRANCE BLAKE MCALLISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALLISTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jul 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989