McAndie, Catherine Margaret (CPSO#: 65178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Healthwise Clinic
15 Lockport Way
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 0H8
Phone: 905 643-5050
Fax: 905 643-9779
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ak-O-Mak Health Clinic
c/o Camp Ak-O-Mak
240 Ak-O-Mak Road
Ahmic Harbour
Magnetawan ON  P0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: (289) 442-4490
Fax: (705) 387-0077
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARGARET MCANDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCANDIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993