McArthur, Anne-Louise Andrea (CPSO#: 67745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4053
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McArthur O'Doherty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. O'Doherty ( CPSO# 67748 )
Dr. A. McArthur ( CPSO# 67745 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Business Address:
Suite 400
920 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K5
Phone Number: (519) 371-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE-LOUISE ANDREA MCARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996