McArthur, Hendrina Susan (CPSO#: 65117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 1300
21 McGivern Street
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-4640
Fax: (519) 881-4648
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul & Susan McArthur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. McArthur ( CPSO# 65117 )
Dr. P. McArthur ( CPSO# 65118 )

Business Address:
21 McGivern Street
Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-4640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENDRINA SUSAN MCARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993