McArthur, Ryan Douglas (CPSO#: 104912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Limerick, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wyndham Medical
75 Wyndham Street South
Guelph ON  N1E 5R3
Phone: (519) 265-4848
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. McArthur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McArthur ( CPSO# 104912)

Business Address:
Wyndham Medical
75 Wyndham Street South
Guelph ON  N1E 5R3
Phone Number: (519) 265-4848

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN DOUGLAS MCARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2017