McAssey, Karen Lynn (CPSO#: 67790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
2G Clinic
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LYNN MCASSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCASSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1999