McAuley, Diane Pierrette Marie (CPSO#: 43026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: Lefebvre, Diane Pierrette Marie (used until: 25 Jun 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE PIERRETTE MARIE MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986