McAuley, James Patrick (CPSO#: 43597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus Site B9 006
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3307
Fax: (519) 663-3043
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985