McAuley, John Thomas (CPSO#: 52920)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario St Walk in Clinic
318 Ontario St
St Catharines
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Phone: 905-682-0444
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Walk-In Clinic Walmart
7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5
Canada
Phone: (289) 477-6011
Fax: (289) 477-6022
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

90 dundas st east
Waterdown Walk in Clinic at Walmart
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H2
Canada
Phone: (905) 690-1418
Fax: (905) 690-9862
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McAuley ( CPSO# 52920 )

Business Address:
P O Box 10
2772 Regional Road 81
Jordan Station ON  L0R 1S0
Phone Number: (905) 562-4874

Business Address:
318 Ontario Street
Waterdown ON  L2R 5L8
Phone Number: (905) 682-0444

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
7418 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5

Business Address:
90 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1985