McAuley, Paul (CPSO#: 60019)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 2011