McAuley, Thomas Jeffrey (CPSO#: 68994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323 Ext. 5388
Fax: (519) 524-8513
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinton Community
Psychiatric Clinic
P O Box 343
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8316
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

ACTT
28 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Canada
Phone: 519-527-8421
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TJ McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McAuley ( CPSO# 68994 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
Clinton Community Psychiatry Clinic
56 Mary Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 524-8316

Business Address:
28 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 527-8421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS JEFFREY MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000