McBean, Nora Margaret (CPSO#: 62240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 600
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 737-4809 Ext. 2395
Fax: (613) 739-3723
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORA MARGARET MCBEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Oct 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1992