McBride, Kathryn Lee (CPSO#: 71437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1999


Former Name: Jenkins, Kathryn Lee (used until: 10 Feb 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Langstaff Drive
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone: (613) 839-3271
Fax: (813) 839-3273
Electoral District: 07


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KATHRYN LEE MCBRIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBRIDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999