McBride, Simon Peter (CPSO#: 61141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
574 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 4X9
Phone: 905-646-0063
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital Campus Rm.B416
Dept. of Otolaryngology Head & Neck
Commissioner's Road
London ON  N6C 4G5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 53020
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. McBride Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McBride ( CPSO# 61141 )

Business Address:
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Business Address:
15 Lockport Way
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 0H8

Business Address:
Bunting & Carlton Medical Clinic
574 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 4X9

Medical Records Location

Address: Bunting & Carlton Medical Clinic c/o Dr. Simon McBride 574 Carlton Street St. Catharines ON L2M 4X9
Instructions: Patients looking for medical records can write to Dr. McBride at the above address.
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON PETER MCBRIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBRIDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992