McCabe, Amelia Nicole (CPSO#: 90522)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3431 Kirklees Road
Winston Salem NC  27104
United States

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2014