Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McCabe, Gregory Paul (CPSO#: 51088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58525
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 westminster ave london ontario
London ON  N6C 2R5
Canada
Phone: (519) 858-8370
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. McCabe ( CPSO# 51088 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986