McCabe, Philip Charles (CPSO#: 29005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Ont Aboriginal Health Ctr
425-427 William Street
London ON  N6B 3E1
Phone: (519) 672-4079
Fax: (519) 672-7220
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

General Dynamics
1991 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5V 2Z7
Canada
Phone: (519) 964-5450
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip C. McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McCabe ( CPSO# 29005 )

Business Address:
425 - 427 William Street
London ON  N6B 3E1
Phone Number: (519) 672-4079

Business Address:
1991 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5V 2Z7
Phone Number: (519) 964-5450

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP CHARLES MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1977