McCabe, Steven James (CPSO#: 51089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2009


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5455
Fax: (416) 603-5392
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. STEVEN JAMES MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009