McCaffrey, Lisa Marie (CPSO#: 74879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: Rodi, Lisa Marie (used until: 16 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 121
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 252-4994
Fax: (519) 252-4995
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McCaffrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McCaffrey ( CPSO# 80268 )
Dr. L. McCaffrey ( CPSO# 74879 )

Business Address:
North Walkerville Medical Centre
2425 Tecumseh Road
Suite 106
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MARIE MCCAFFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCAFFREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2006