McCaffrey, Michael Cameron (CPSO#: 80268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Walkerville Medical Centre
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 106
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McCaffrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McCaffrey ( CPSO# 80268 )
Dr. L. McCaffrey ( CPSO# 74879 )

Business Address:
North Walkerville Medical Centre
2425 Tecumseh Road
Suite 106
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CAMERON MCCAFFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCAFFREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2003 to 19 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006