McCain, Willard Gregory (CPSO#: 21903)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 287 Bare's Way Stouffville ON L4A 0K5
Date Received: 15 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015