McCalden, Richard William (CPSO#: 56833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3049
Fax: (519) 663-3208
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McCalden Bryk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McCalden ( CPSO# 56833 )
Dr. C. Bryk ( CPSO# 56735 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3049

Business Address:
Colborne Family Medical Centre
612 Colborne Street
London ON  N6B 2V2
Phone Number: (519) 673-1962

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM MCCALDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1988