McCall, John Gerald (CPSO#: 23070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone: (705) 445-5141
Fax: (705) 445-9419
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GERALD MCCALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1970 to 31 Dec 1970
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1970