McCall, Margaret Ann (CPSO#: 32216)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. K. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McCall ( CPSO# 32216 )
Dr. R. Edwards ( CPSO# 50475 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Medical Records Location

Address: Willow Clinic 325 University Avenue Kingston, ON, K7L 3R4
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2016