McCall, Richard Hooshang (CPSO#: 76795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
517 McGill Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1R1
Phone: (613) 632-9500
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard H. McCall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McCall ( CPSO# 76795 )

Business Address:
517 McGill Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1R1
Phone Number: (613) 632-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD HOOSHANG MCCALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2001 to 24 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2001