McCallum, Andrew Lemay (CPSO#: 32709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2368
Fax: (647) 428-2022
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annette McCallum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 32709 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Kingston MRI and KMI
77 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW LEMAY MCCALLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALLUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981