McCallum, Kimberley Christal (CPSO#: 59846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
161 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V3
Phone: (905) 627-1555
Fax: (905) 627-1444
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY CHRISTAL MCCALLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALLUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Oct 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1989