McCann, Maureen (CPSO#: 21128)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. McCann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 2409 Yonge St Suite 200 Toronto, ON M4P 2E7
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017