McCann, Shawn Charles (CPSO#: 67774)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998