McCann, Thomas Joseph (CPSO#: 22997)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.J. McCann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Bronte Medical Group 78 Jones Street Oakville ON L6L 6C5
Date Received: 26 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016