McCannel, Tara Alexandra (CPSO#: 70135)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Young, Tara Alexandra (used until: 08 Jul 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015