McCans, John Lyall (CPSO#: 27557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Cardiology
C1 - 010
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2306
Fax: (613) 544-9560
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 11 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LYALL MCCANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002