McCarter, Shannon Allvey (CPSO#: 103465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ALLVEY MCCARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2017