McCarthy, Anne Eileen (CPSO#: 55996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave. Box 233
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19388
Fax: (613) 761-5260
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.E. McCarthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McCarthy ( CPSO# 55996 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital Campus
G12 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8184

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite CPC-206
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE EILEEN MCCARTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988