McCarthy, Denise Mary (CPSO#: 97160)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 15 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012