McCarthy, Veronica Joan (CPSO#: 74938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78010
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veronica McCarthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. McCarthy ( CPSO# 74938 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERONICA JOAN MCCARTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005