McCarty, Tracey Stephanie (CPSO#: 66551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone: (905) 528-8744
Fax: (905) 528-5849
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. McCarty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McCarty ( CPSO# 66551 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 528-8744

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACEY STEPHANIE MCCARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1995